OK SB1749 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; allowing for sale of beer on golf course or country club. Emergency.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; allowing for sale of beer on golf course or country club. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 20; Ayes: 68 Nays: 18 |
2022-04-26 | House | General Order |
2022-04-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |