OK SB1745 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife; increasing penalties for trespassing on any refuge or Wildlife Management Area. Effective date.
Title
Wildlife; increasing penalties for trespassing on any refuge or Wildlife Management Area. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Wildlife |
2022-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |