OK SB1743 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Hunting; creating the Landowner's Hunting Freedom Act. Effective date.
Title
Hunting; creating the Landowner's Hunting Freedom Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] | Sen. Greg Childers [R] |
Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Jerry Ellis [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] |
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. James Lockhart [D] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] |
Sen. Judy McIntyre [D] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Sen. Steve Russell [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] |
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 78 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2012 | |
2012-05-23 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-23 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-23 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-22 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-22 | To Senate | |
2012-05-22 | Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 3 | |
2012-05-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2012-05-22 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-17 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-15 | CCR read | |
2012-05-08 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-05-07 | SCs named Russell, Fields, Sykes, Treat, Burrage, Garrison | |
2012-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-30 | HAs read | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 5 | |
2012-04-26 | Amended | |
2012-04-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders, Lockhart, Bennett, Kern, Roberts (Sean) | |
2012-04-26 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Eason McIntyre, Ellis, Simpson, Johnson (Rob), Justice | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 | |
2012-03-14 | coauthored by Newberry, Shortey, Ivester, Marlatt, Treat, Brinkley, Childers, David, Schulz, Brecheen | |
2012-03-14 | Title restored | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Tourism and Wildlife committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Russell | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |