OK SB1741 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Business entities; modifying requirements for corporations, limited liability companies and limited partnerships. Effective date.
Title
Business entities; modifying requirements for corporations, limited liability companies and limited partnerships. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |