OK SB1733 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Open Records Act; modifying definitions. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Open Records Act; modifying definitions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: FAILED (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: FAILED (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 24 |
2022-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 27 Nays: 17 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-16 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Treat, Daniels, Howard, Jech, Leewright, Floyd, Brooks |
2022-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-05-02 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-05-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 19 |
2022-04-28 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-28 | House | Title stricken |
2022-04-28 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-04-28 | House | Adoption of floor substitute rescinded |
2022-04-28 | House | Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order |
2022-04-28 | House | Recalled from engrossment |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 18 |
2022-04-28 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-04-28 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-04-28 | House | General Order |
2022-04-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore |
2022-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Howard |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Howard; authored by Senator Treat |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Treat |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Judiciary |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Treat |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Treat; authored by Senator Howard |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |