OK SB173 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB173
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public trusts; providing for applicability of Public Competitive Bidding Act of 1974 and Fair Pay for Construction Act to certain public contracts. Effective date.
Title
Public trusts; providing for applicability of Public Competitive Bidding Act of 1974 and Fair Pay for Construction Act to certain public contracts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 5 |
2022-04-26 | House | General Order |
2022-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2022-03-31 | House | Withdrawn from Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency |
2022-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB173 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)