OK SB1725 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; business interests and acts prohibited for manufacturers; providing certain exception. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; business interests and acts prohibited for manufacturers; providing certain exception. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateEnacting clause stricken
2020-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-27SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2020-02-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2020-02-11SenateRemove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Coleman
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Smalley
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback