OK SB1716 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; making it unlawful to cut or damage a fence used for certain purposes. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; making it unlawful to cut or damage a fence used for certain purposes. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-23 CCR submitted
2012-05-23 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
2012-05-23 coauthored by Garrison
2012-05-23 CCR adopted, GCCA
2012-05-22 Emergency added
2012-05-22 CCR read, GCCA
2012-05-08 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources
2012-05-07 SCs named GCCA
2012-05-03 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-30 HAs read
2012-04-26 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-25 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 37
2012-04-25 Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Cockroft, Dorman
2012-04-25 General Order
2012-04-04 Title restored
2012-04-04 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee
2012-03-28 Referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee
2012-03-28 Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2012-03-21 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2012-03-19 First Reading
2012-03-19 Engrossed to House
2012-03-15 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-15 Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1
2012-03-15 coauthored by Brecheen
2012-03-15 General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2012-03-15 Senate Rule suspended
2012-03-01 Title stricken
2012-03-01 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2012-02-16 Referred to Appropriations
2012-02-16 coauthored by Armes (principal House author)
2012-02-16 Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Sparks
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback