OK SB171 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB171
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Remove as author Senator Newberry; authored by Senator Bice
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Remove as author Senator Newberry; authored by Senator Bice
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Capital Formation Act; powers and duties of Capital Investment Board; deleting specified limitations on actions. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Capital Formation Act; powers and duties of Capital Investment Board; deleting specified limitations on actions. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Newberry; authored by Senator Bice |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB171 (Carry Over) 2017-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 5085 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5085 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5085 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5085 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5085 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |