OK SB1707 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Elections; modifying dates upon which special elections may be held. Effective date.
Title
Elections; modifying dates upon which special elections may be held. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-18 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 27 | |
2012-04-18 | General Order | |
2012-03-28 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Motion to reconsider vote tabled | |
2012-03-05 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Treat | |
2012-03-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 | |
2012-03-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Treat | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |