OK SB1703 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Vetoed 05/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Sales tax; modifying exemption for sales to certain entities related to University Hospitals Trust. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax; modifying exemption for sales to certain entities related to University Hospitals Trust. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenateVetoed 05/18/2020
2020-05-12SenateSent to Governor
2020-05-12HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-12SenateEnrolled, to House
2020-05-11SenateReferred for enrollment
2020-05-11HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 16
2020-05-11HouseGeneral Order
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2020-03-17HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2020-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6
2020-03-03SenateTitle restored
2020-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2020-02-26SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-26SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2020-02-18SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-18SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2020-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-03SenateRemove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Thompson
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Smalley
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback