OK SB1702 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health; creating the Medical Treatment Laws Information Act; State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision to develop brochure. Effective date.
Title
Public health; creating the Medical Treatment Laws Information Act; State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision to develop brochure. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health |
2014-05-06 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2014-05-05 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-24 | Senate | coauthored by Ritze |
2014-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2014-04-23 | House | Title stricken |
2014-04-23 | House | Amended |
2014-04-23 | House | General Order |
2014-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred to Public Health Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Hamilton (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |