OK SB1701 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Vetoed 05/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Militia; specifying that the Adjutant General is the chief military advisor to the Governor. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Militia; specifying that the Adjutant General is the chief military advisor to the Governor. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Vetoed 05/16/2012
2012-05-16 Veto message read
2012-05-10 Sent to Governor
2012-05-10 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-10 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-09 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-09 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2012-05-09 coauthored by Johnson (Constance)
2012-05-09 HAs adopted
2012-04-03 HAs read
2012-04-03 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-02 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-02 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2012-04-02 Amended
2012-04-02 General Order
2012-03-27 Coauthored by Representative(s) Wesselhoft, Bennett
2012-03-27 CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
2012-03-12 First Reading
2012-03-12 Engrossed to House
2012-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-08 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
2012-03-08 General Order, Considered
2012-02-21 coauthored by Ivester
2012-02-21 coauthored by Jordan (principal House author)
2012-02-21 Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Sykes
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
442323Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
4423310New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback