OK SB1698 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Supervised lenders; deleting supervised lenders from automatic change under certain Reference Base Index; maximum loan amounts and charges.
Title
Supervised lenders; deleting supervised lenders from automatic change under certain Reference Base Index; maximum loan amounts and charges.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/13/2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 12 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Newberry |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 23 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3; Ayes: 61 Nays: 32 |
2014-04-23 | House | General Order |
2014-04-03 | House | Emergency added |
2014-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14A | 1 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 3 | 508A | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |