OK SB1695 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Banking, Financial Services and Pensions, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Banking, Financial Services and Pensions, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Consumer Credit Code; finance charge for supervised loans; permitting a loan closing fee. Effective date.
Title
Uniform Consumer Credit Code; finance charge for supervised loans; permitting a loan closing fee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Banking, Financial Services and Pensions, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2020-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |