OK SB1685 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Business and Commerce, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Business and Commerce, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act; making certain charitable entities exempt under certain federal provisions. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act; making certain charitable entities exempt under certain federal provisions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2020-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |