OK SB1683 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State parks; prohibiting entering a state park where an entry fee is required; exception for passholders. Emergency.
Title
State parks; prohibiting entering a state park where an entry fee is required; exception for passholders. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |