OK SB167 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB167

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; overload permit exemption. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; overload permit exemption. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2017-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-08SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-07SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2017-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-02-22SenateCoauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
2017-02-21SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-21SenateReported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB167 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4714109New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback