OK SB1667 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Intoxicating liquor; low-point beer and alcoholic beverage licenses. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Intoxicating liquor; low-point beer and alcoholic beverage licenses. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-17 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-16 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 9 | |
2012-04-16 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Jackson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Emergency added | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 163 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 163 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |