OK SB1665 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Oil and gas; enacting the Energy Litigation Reform Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas; enacting the Energy Litigation Reform Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
2012-05-03 Sent to Governor
2012-05-03 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-03 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-01 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-01 Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2012-05-01 coauthored by Johnson (Constance)
2012-05-01 HAs adopted
2012-04-24 HAs read
2012-04-24 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-23 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-23 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 2
2012-04-23 Amended
2012-04-23 General Order
2012-04-10 Title restored
2012-04-10 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2012-03-14 First Reading
2012-03-14 Engrossed to House
2012-03-13 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-13 Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
2012-03-13 coauthored by Shortey
2012-03-13 General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2012-02-27 Title stricken
2012-02-27 Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2012-02-22 Referred to Rules
2012-02-22 coauthored by Jordan (principal House author)
2012-02-22 Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2012-02-21 Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Rules Committee
2012-02-21 Withdrawn from Judiciary committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob)
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5231821New CodeSee Bill Text
5231822New CodeSee Bill Text
5231823New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback