OK SB1659 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax credits; modifying certain Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act reporting dates. Effective date.
Title
Tax credits; modifying certain Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act reporting dates. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-19 | House | General Order |
2022-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dills (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newhouse |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |