OK SB1653 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; creating craft distiller licenses; establishing annual license fee. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; creating craft distiller licenses; establishing annual license fee. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
2020-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-20SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2020-02-11SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Coleman
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback