OK SB1633 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; creating the School District Transparency Act; requiring school district expenditure information be made available on State Department of Education website. Effective date.
Title
Schools; creating the School District Transparency Act; requiring school district expenditure information be made available on State Department of Education website. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Blackwell [R] | Sen. Randall Brogdon [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] |
Rep. Scott Inman [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Daniel Sullivan [R] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | To Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 22 | |
2010-05-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs, Sullivan, Derby | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-17 | Conference granted, HC's named Blackwell, Coody, Kern, Brannon, Glenn | |
2010-05-11 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-05-11 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-14 | HAs read | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 | |
2010-04-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Inman | |
2010-04-13 | General Order | |
2010-04-01 | Title restored | |
2010-04-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2010-04-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | coauthored by Gumm, Ivester | |
2010-03-01 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Blackwell (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-15 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Blackwell | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-03 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Brogdon | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |