OK SB1629 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Alcoholic Beverage Control Act; adding definitions for small farm producer. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Alcoholic Beverage Control Act; adding definitions for small farm producer. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-06HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2020-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
2020-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2020-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2020-02-20SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator David
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback