OK SB1628 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Labor; repealing contractors to employ resident employees and most hazardous industries list. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Labor; repealing contractors to employ resident employees and most hazardous industries list. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/07/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | To Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Motion expired | |
2010-05-25 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Murphey | |
2010-05-25 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 36 | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 37 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-24 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-24 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-18 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-18 | Title restored | |
2010-05-18 | CCR read | |
2010-05-04 | Conference granted, HC's named Murphey, Martin (Scott), Terrill, Kiesel, Shelton | |
2010-05-04 | SCs named Coates, Newberry, Brogdon, Myers, Leftwich, Rice | |
2010-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-22 | Motion expired | |
2010-04-20 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Murphey | |
2010-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 8; Ayes: 51 Nays: 36 | |
2010-04-20 | General Order | |
2010-03-24 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-24 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Murphey (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Murphey | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Business and Labor | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 193 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 425 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |