OK SB1624 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School meals; granting the Board of Agriculture the authority to administer the National School Lunch Act. Effective date.
Title
School meals; granting the Board of Agriculture the authority to administer the National School Lunch Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2022-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |