OK SB1615 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Energy and Natural Resources, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Energy and Natural Resources, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Corporation Commission; creating the Task Force on Injection Well Stability; establishing terms of task force. Effective date.
Title
Corporation Commission; creating the Task Force on Injection Well Stability; establishing terms of task force. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Energy and Natural Resources, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2020-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sanders (principal House author) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Paxton |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |