OK SB1612 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement unification; creating the Oklahoma Department of Public Safety Unification, Recruitment, and Retention Act of 2022; creating the Board of Public Safety. Effective date.
Title
Law enforcement unification; creating the Oklahoma Department of Public Safety Unification, Recruitment, and Retention Act of 2022; creating the Board of Public Safety. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: , THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SCs named David, Weaver, McCortney, Standridge, Dahm, Dossett (J.J.) |
2022-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-05-02 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-05-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 40 |
2022-04-27 | House | General Order |
2022-04-12 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Garvin |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Garvin |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |