OK SB1600 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - Measure failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 68
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - Measure failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 68
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to privatization; modifying conditions for requirement; modifying responsibilities of agency. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State government; relating to privatization; modifying conditions for requirement; modifying responsibilities of agency. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 29 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2010-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Measure failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 68 | |
2010-05-28 | Ayes: 35 Nays: 31 | |
2010-05-28 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-28 | Laid over | |
2010-05-28 | Considered | |
2010-05-28 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12 | |
2010-05-28 | Remove as coauthor Senator Sykes | |
2010-05-28 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-27 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-05-26 | Further conference granted, HCs named: Schwartz, Miller, Joyner, Shannon, Hilliard, Morgan | |
2010-05-26 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | coauthored by Sykes | |
2010-05-21 | Title restored | |
2010-05-21 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-19 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Sykes | |
2010-05-10 | Conference granted, HC's named Schwartz, Martin (Scott), Murphey, McDaniel (Jeannie), Nations, Miller | |
2010-04-28 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-27 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-15 | HAs read | |
2010-04-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 17 | |
2010-04-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2010-04-14 | General Order | |
2010-04-06 | Emergency added | |
2010-04-06 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-11 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Schwartz | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-03 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 588 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 589 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 85 | 12c | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 3A | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 42 | New Code | See Bill Text |