OK SB1599 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; relating to voluntary donations from income tax refunds; providing repealer. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; relating to voluntary donations from income tax refunds; providing repealer. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: OK DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Died in GCCA
2010-05-04 Conference granted, HC's named DeWitt, Miller, Martin (Scott), Glenn, Shoemake, Hickman
2010-04-28 SCs named GCCA
2010-04-27 HAs rejected, conference requested
2010-04-14 HAs read
2010-04-14 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-04-13 Referred for engrossment
2010-04-13 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
2010-04-13 General Order
2010-04-05 Title restored
2010-04-05 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2010-03-16 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2010-03-03 First Reading
2010-03-03 Engrossed to House
2010-03-02 Referred for engrossment
2010-03-02 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2010-03-02 General Order, Considered
2010-02-18 coauthored by DeWitt (principal House author)
2010-02-18 Title stricken
2010-02-18 Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2010-02-17 Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR
2010-02-09 Pending authorship Representative(s) DeWitt
2010-02-02 Second Reading referred to Finance
2010-02-01 Authored by Senator Myers
2010-02-01 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6823688Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6823689Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback