OK SB1595 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Vetoed 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; ad valorem exemptions for certain qualifying manufacturing concerns. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; ad valorem exemptions for certain qualifying manufacturing concerns. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateVetoed 05/21/2020
2020-05-15SenateSent to Governor
2020-05-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2020-05-15SenateEnrolled, to House
2020-05-15SenateReferred for enrollment
2020-05-15SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2020-05-15SenateHAs adopted
2020-05-14SenateHAs read
2020-05-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-05-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-05-14HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
2020-05-14HouseEmergency added
2020-05-14HouseAmended by floor substitute
2020-05-14HouseTitle restored
2020-05-14HouseAmended
2020-05-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McCall
2020-05-14HouseRemove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Wallace
2020-05-14HouseGeneral Order
2020-05-06HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2020-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2020-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2020-03-03SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
2020-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-25SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Treat
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1595&Session=2000
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB1595%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB1595%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB1595%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB1595%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1595%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB1595%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1595_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1595_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback