OK SB1591 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Driver licenses; modifying requirements concerning the issuance of application and periods of certain driver licenses; creating certain fee; providing certain preclusions. Effective date.
Title
Driver licenses; modifying requirements concerning the issuance of application and periods of certain driver licenses; creating certain fee; providing certain preclusions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 11 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brooks |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |