OK SB1591 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation Combined DNA Index; modifying scheduled substances. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation Combined DNA Index; modifying scheduled substances. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2020-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10
2020-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-02-24SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2020-02-17SenateCoauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author)
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Weaver
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback