OK SB1588 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Oklahoma Health Care Authority; making an appropriation. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Health Care Authority; making an appropriation. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
2010-05-28 Sent to Governor
2010-05-28 Signed, returned to Senate
2010-05-28 Enrolled, to House
2010-05-28 Referred for enrollment
2010-05-27 To Senate
2010-05-27 Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 4
2010-05-27 CCR adopted, GCCA
2010-05-27 CCR submitted, GCCA
2010-05-27 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
2010-05-27 CCR adopted, GCCA
2010-05-27 Enacting clause restored
2010-05-27 Title restored
2010-05-27 CCR read, GCCA
2010-04-28 Conference granted, GCCA
2010-04-28 SCs named GCCA
2010-04-28 HAs rejected, conference requested
2010-04-07 HAs read
2010-04-07 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-04-06 Referred for engrossment
2010-04-06 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3
2010-04-06 Enacting clause stricken
2010-04-06 Amended
2010-04-06 General Order
2010-03-16 Second Reading, direct to Calendar
2010-03-10 First Reading
2010-03-10 Engrossed to House
2010-03-09 Referred for engrossment
2010-03-09 Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2010-03-09 Title stricken
2010-03-09 General Order, Amended
2010-02-04 Direct to Calendar
2010-02-01 coauthored by Miller, Martin (Scott) (principal House author)
2010-02-01 coauthored by Myers
2010-02-01 Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike)
2010-02-01 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
86(n/a)See Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback