OK SB1587 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans; creating K-I-A Reinterment Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Veterans; creating K-I-A Reinterment Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin) |
2022-04-20 | House | General Order |
2022-04-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2022-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2022-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |