OK SB1582 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Approved by Governor 03/05/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Approved by Governor 03/05/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations; making appropriation to Oklahoma Education Lottery Trust Fund. Emergency.
Title
Appropriations; making appropriation to Oklahoma Education Lottery Trust Fund. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 03/05/2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5 |
2018-03-01 | House | JCR adopted |
2018-03-01 | House | General Order |
2018-02-28 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Casey |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fields |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2018-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |