OK SB1578 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Chiropractors; authorizing the Board of Chiropractic Examiners to issue a temporary license. Effective date.
Title
Chiropractors; authorizing the Board of Chiropractic Examiners to issue a temporary license. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Laid over | |
2012-04-26 | General Order | |
2012-04-03 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-22 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2012-02-22 | coauthored by Faught (principal House author) | |
2012-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |