OK SB1569 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Public Safety, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Public Safety, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Human trafficking; requiring certain training. Effective date.
Title
Human trafficking; requiring certain training. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David) (principal House author) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |