OK SB1566 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Earned discharge credits; directing certain compliance credits be given. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Earned discharge credits; directing certain compliance credits be given. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2020-03-09HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-09SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-05SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-05SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2020-03-05SenateTitle restored
2020-03-05SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2020-02-26SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-26SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2020-02-17SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-17SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2020-02-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Shaw
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback