OK SB1566 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma historical sites; authorizing development of certain programs and materials; authorizing use of certain funding. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma historical sites; authorizing development of certain programs and materials; authorizing use of certain funding. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2018-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 5 |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |