OK SB156 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB156
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Trauma Systems Improvement and Development Act; setting forth certain provisions related to rules and meetings. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Trauma Systems Improvement and Development Act; setting forth certain provisions related to rules and meetings. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 |
2019-04-23 | House | Title restored |
2019-04-23 | House | Amended |
2019-04-23 | House | General Order |
2019-04-11 | House | Title stricken |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB156 (Carry Over) 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019