OK SB1559 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Office of Management and Enterprise Services; prohibiting risk management director from directing certain insurance purchases for institutions of higher education. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Management and Enterprise Services; prohibiting risk management director from directing certain insurance purchases for institutions of higher education. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-23SenateApproved by Governor 04/22/2024
2024-04-17SenateSent to Governor
2024-04-17HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2024-04-17SenateEnrolled, to House
2024-04-16SenateReferred for enrollment
2024-04-16HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2024-04-16HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 4
2024-04-16HouseGeneral Order
2024-03-26HouseCR; Do Pass General Government Committee
2024-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to General Government
2024-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2024-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2024-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2024-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2024-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2024-02-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
2024-02-06SenateReported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2024-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2024-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Pugh
2024-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1559&Session=2400
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB1559%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB1559%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB1559%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB1559%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/SB/SB1559%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1559%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1559%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1559_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1559_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback