OK SB1557 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Coauthored by Senator Brecheen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Roofing; exceptions from registration; exempting certain metal structures. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Roofing; exceptions from registration; exempting certain metal structures. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-28SenateRemove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Jech
2018-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
2018-02-08SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-08SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5911519New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback