OK SB1557 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Coauthored by Senator Brecheen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Coauthored by Senator Brecheen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Roofing; exceptions from registration; exempting certain metal structures. Effective date.
Title
Roofing; exceptions from registration; exempting certain metal structures. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brecheen |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Jech |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |