OK SB1552 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Vetoed 05/20/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Physician licensure; directing Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision and State Board of Osteopathic Examiners to revoke licenses for performing abortion. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician licensure; directing Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision and State Board of Osteopathic Examiners to revoke licenses for performing abortion. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-20SenateVetoed 05/20/2016
2016-05-20SenateVeto message read
2016-05-19SenateSent to Governor
2016-05-19HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-05-19SenateEnrolled, to House
2016-05-19SenateReferred for enrollment
2016-05-19SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12
2016-05-19SenateHAs adopted
2016-05-19Senatecoauthored by Newberry
2016-04-28SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Sharp
2016-04-25Senatecoauthored by Murphey
2016-04-25SenateHAs read
2016-04-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-04-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-04-21HouseMotion expired
2016-04-21HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Brumbaugh
2016-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 9
2016-04-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Dunlap
2016-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2016-03-30HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Vaughan, Faught, Johnson, Cooksey, Roberts (Sean)
2016-03-30HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2016-03-14HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2016-03-09HouseFirst Reading
2016-03-09SenateEngrossed to House
2016-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-03-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
2016-03-08SenateTitle restored
2016-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2016-03-08Senatecoauthored by Brecheen
2016-03-08Senatecoauthored by Allen
2016-03-02Senatecoauthored by Bennett
2016-02-25Senatecoauthored by Sharp
2016-02-22SenateTitle stricken
2016-02-22SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2016-02-22Senatecoauthored by Moore
2016-02-04Senatecoauthored by Strohm
2016-02-03Senatecoauthored by Brumbaugh (principal House author)
2016-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2016-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2016-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
631730New CodeSee Bill Text
631731New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1552&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB1552%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB1552%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB1552%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1552%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB1552%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1552%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB1552%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB1552_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB1552_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback