OK SB1551 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - coauthored by Murphey
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Parental rights; creating Parental Rights Immunization Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental rights; creating Parental Rights Immunization Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19Senatecoauthored by Murphey
2018-02-08SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback