OK SB155 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement officers; providing dual office holding exemption for certain Scenic Rivers Commission officers. Emergency.
Title
Law enforcement officers; providing dual office holding exemption for certain Scenic Rivers Commission officers. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 14 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 14 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/06/2015 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 12 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 12 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 30 Nays: 10 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Shaw |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 27 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 12 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amended |
2015-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Fourkiller (principal House author) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |