OK SB1546 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; expanding enforcement authority of certain officers. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; expanding enforcement authority of certain officers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Approved by Governor 04/17/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-10 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox, Walker | |
2012-04-10 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Jackson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Shortey | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |