OK SB1544 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Transportation; requiring certain signage. Effective date.
Title
Department of Transportation; requiring certain signage. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Title restored |
2018-04-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 15 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |