OK SB1544 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Officers; modifying exception to dual office holding provision. Effective date.
Title
Officers; modifying exception to dual office holding provision. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-17 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-16 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 22 | |
2012-04-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett | |
2012-04-16 | General Order | |
2012-04-05 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | |
2012-03-12 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Shortey | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |